|
05/19/2022
|
Chapter No. 2022-128
|
|
|
|
05/18/2022
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/18/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 33 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Substituted for SB 1582
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 115, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Reported out of Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Favorable by Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
Added to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Now in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Referred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Reported out of Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
PCS added to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/03/2022
|
Now in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/03/2022
|
Referred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/15/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|