Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0943 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 16, 2021

Analysis

Analysis February 15, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022
Analysis January 21, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill January 25, 2022