Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0953 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 17, 2021

Analysis

Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 16, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022
Analysis February 6, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 24, 2022