Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Died in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2022
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 107, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/24/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Favorable by Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Now in Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Reported out of Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Favorable by Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Added to Government Operations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Remaining referral: Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Now in Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Reported out of Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Added to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/07/2022
|
Now in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/07/2022
|
Referred to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/17/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|