Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0993 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 21, 2021

Enrolled

Bill March 10, 2022

Analysis

Analysis March 23, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis February 4, 2022
Analysis January 31, 2022
Analysis January 28, 2022
Analysis January 19, 2022
Analysis January 14, 2022