Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1001 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 21, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 1, 2022
Analysis March 23, 2022
Analysis February 22, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 10, 2022
Analysis February 4, 2022
Analysis January 19, 2022
Analysis January 15, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 22, 2022
Bill February 10, 2022