Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1017 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 12/27/2021

                               
 
HB 1017  	2022 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb1017-00 
Page 1 of 3 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
A bill to be entitled 1 
An act relating to K -12 educational support employees; 2 
creating s. 1012.411, F.S.; requiring district school 3 
superintendents to identify critical employment 4 
shortages of educational support employees within the 5 
school district; defining the term "critical 6 
employment shortage"; requiring school districts to 7 
fund specified incentives, subject to legislative 8 
appropriation; requiring district school 9 
superintendents to annually provide a report to the 10 
Legislature by a specified date; providing 11 
requirements for the report; amending s. 1012.38, 12 
F.S.; requiring, rather than authorizing, school 13 
districts to adopt and implement specified programs 14 
for the career developme nt of education 15 
paraprofessionals by a specified date, subject to 16 
legislative appropriation; providing an effective 17 
date. 18 
 19 
 WHEREAS, the state has a vested interest in addressing the 20 
critical employment shortage of educational support employees, 21 
including education paraprofessionals, in the state, and 22 
 WHEREAS, educational support employees are valued and vital 23 
members of the education workforce whose work ensures student 24 
success from prekindergarten through grade 12, and 25     
 
HB 1017  	2022 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb1017-00 
Page 2 of 3 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
 WHEREAS, educational support employees engage students, 26 
keeping them connected to the larger school community and 27 
emotionally and physically healthy and safe, and 28 
 WHEREAS, because educational support employees are vital to 29 
the success of Florida's students, it is in the state's best 30 
interests to provide funding to ensure that the state's public 31 
schools maintain adequate staffing levels for educational 32 
support employees, NOW, THEREFORE, 33 
 34 
Be It Enacted by the Legislature of the State of Florida: 35 
 36 
 Section 1.  Section 1012.411, Flori da Statutes, is created 37 
to read: 38 
 1012.411  Critical employment shortages of educational 39 
support employees.— 40 
 (1)  By April 1, 2023, and annually thereafter, each 41 
district school superintendent must compile a list of critical 42 
employment shortages of educat ional support employees as defined 43 
in s. 1012.40(1), including education paraprofessionals as 44 
defined in s. 1012.01(2)(e), aggregated by position, within the 45 
school district. For purposes of this section, the term 46 
"critical employment shortage" means that at least 20 percent of 47 
a specified position is vacant and unfilled within the school 48 
district. 49 
 (2)  Subject to legislative appropriation, each school 50     
 
HB 1017  	2022 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb1017-00 
Page 3 of 3 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
district must fund incentives to help recruit and retain 51 
educational support employees for positions with a critical 52 
employment shortage. 53 
 (3)  By December 1, 2023, and annually thereafter, each 54 
district school superintendent shall provide a report to the 55 
President of the Senate and the Speaker of the House of 56 
Representatives that includes a list of positions with a 57 
critical employment shortage and how the school district used 58 
the funding under subsection (2) to implement the required 59 
incentives. 60 
 Section 2.  Paragraph (a) of subsection (1) of section 61 
1012.38, Florida Statutes, is amended to read: 62 
 1012.38  Education paraprofessional career development. — 63 
 (1)(a)  By July 1, 2023, and subject to legislative 64 
appropriation, each school district shall may adopt and 65 
implement a program for the career development of education 66 
paraprofessionals. The purpose of the program is to provide to 67 
education paraprofessionals a system of career development which 68 
is based upon education and training advancement, and to furnish 69 
economic incentives to encourage excellence among education 70 
paraprofessionals. 71 
 Section 3.  This act shall take effect July 1, 2022. 72