House | 03/14/2022 | Died in Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | Now in Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | Reported out of Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | Favorable by Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Added to Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/07/2022 | Now in Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/07/2022 | Referred to Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 01/07/2022 | Referred to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 01/07/2022 | Referred to Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/07/2022 | Referred to Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee | ||
House | 12/27/2021 | Filed |