House | 03/14/2022 | Died in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/07/2022 | Now in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/07/2022 | Referred to Commerce Committee | ||
House | 01/07/2022 | Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/07/2022 | Referred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee | ||
House | 12/28/2021 | Filed |