Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1057 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 28, 2021

Enrolled

Bill March 7, 2022

Analysis

Analysis March 16, 2022
Analysis February 28, 2022
Analysis January 27, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 28, 2022
Bill January 28, 2022