House
|
03/08/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 292
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Favorable by Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
Now in Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
Reported out of Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Added to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
Reported out of Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Added to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2022
|
Now in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2022
|
Referred to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/29/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|