Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Received | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | In Messages | ||
House | 02/02/2022 | CS passed; YEAS 115, NAYS 0 | ||
House | 02/02/2022 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 02/01/2022 | Added to Third Reading Calendar | ||
House | 02/01/2022 | Placed on 3rd reading | ||
House | 02/01/2022 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 01/27/2022 | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/1/2022) | ||
House | 01/27/2022 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 01/27/2022 | Bill referred to House Calendar | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | CS Filed | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | Reported out of State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | Favorable with CS by State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 01/24/2022 | PCS added to State Affairs Committee agenda | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/10/2022 | Now in State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 01/10/2022 | Referred to State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 12/29/2021 | Filed |