Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1097 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 3, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 2, 2022

Analysis

Analysis May 23, 2022
Analysis March 16, 2022
Analysis February 2, 2022
Analysis January 28, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022
Analysis January 21, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 3, 2022