House
|
03/10/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Withdrawn from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Placed on Local Calendar, 03/10/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Passed; YEAS 77, NAYS 38
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Amendment 624395 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/22/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Favorable by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Reported out of Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Favorable by Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Added to Ways & Means Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Now in Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Reported out of Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Favorable by Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/14/2022
|
Added to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2022
|
Now in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2022
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2022
|
Referred to Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2022
|
Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/03/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|