House | 03/14/2022 | Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/10/2022 | Now in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/10/2022 | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 01/10/2022 | Referred to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/03/2022 | Filed |