Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1121 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 3, 2022

Analysis

Analysis March 11, 2022
Analysis February 24, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis February 9, 2022
Analysis February 5, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 22, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 24, 2022
Bill February 9, 2022
Bill January 26, 2022