House | 03/14/2022 | Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
House | 02/04/2022 | Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/04/2022 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 02/04/2022 | Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/02/2022 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 02/02/2022 | CS Filed | ||
House | 02/02/2022 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 02/02/2022 | Reported out of Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/02/2022 | Favorable with CS by Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/31/2022 | Added to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/10/2022 | Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/10/2022 | Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/04/2022 | Filed |