House | 03/08/2022 | Laid on Table, refer to SB 1360 | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | Bill released to House Calendar | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | Reported out of State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | Favorable by State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 01/24/2022 | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | Now in State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | Reported out of Government Operations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | Favorable by Government Operations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/18/2022 | Added to Government Operations Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/10/2022 | Now in Government Operations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/10/2022 | Referred to State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 01/10/2022 | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/05/2022 | Filed |