Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Died in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2022
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Passed as amended; YEAS 60, NAYS 47
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Amendment 031693 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Favorable by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2022
|
Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Reported out of State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Favorable by State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Added to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Now in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Reported out of Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Favorable by Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Added to Government Operations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2022
|
Now in Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2022
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2022
|
Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2022
|
Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|