House | 03/14/2022 | Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
House | 01/28/2022 | Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/28/2022 | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 01/28/2022 | Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | CS Filed | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | Reported out of Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/25/2022 | Favorable with CS by Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/21/2022 | Added to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | Now in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | Referred to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/05/2022 | Filed |