Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1215 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis February 16, 2022
Analysis February 15, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis February 5, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 16, 2022
Bill February 9, 2022