House
|
03/14/2022
|
Died in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2022
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Reported out of Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
Added to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Reported out of Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Added to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
Now in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|