House
|
03/14/2022
|
Died in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2022
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Reported out of Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
PCS added to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Original reference removed: Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Reported out of Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
PCS added to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|