House | 03/14/2022 | Died in Ways & Means Committee | ||
House | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | Now in Ways & Means Committee | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | Referred to Pandemics & Public Emergencies Committee | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | Referred to Ways & Means Committee | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/07/2022 | Filed |