House | 03/14/2022 | Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
House | 01/28/2022 | Now in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/28/2022 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 01/28/2022 | Referred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | CS Filed | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | Reported out of Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/25/2022 | Favorable with CS by Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/21/2022 | Added to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/07/2022 | Filed |