Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1311 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 7, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 14, 2022
Analysis February 11, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis February 4, 2022