House | 03/14/2022 | Died in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
House | 01/14/2022 | Now in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/14/2022 | Referred to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 01/14/2022 | Referred to Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 01/14/2022 | Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/14/2022 | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/07/2022 | Filed |