House
|
03/10/2022
|
Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 117, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Amendment 678648 Concur
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Added to Senate Message List
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 35 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Amendment(s) adopted (678648)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1710
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Withdrawn from Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 113, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 3)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Now in Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Reported out of Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Added to Appropriations Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Now in Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Reported out of Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Favorable by Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Added to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Original reference removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Reported out of Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
PCS added to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/14/2022
|
Now in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/14/2022
|
Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/14/2022
|
Referred to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/07/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|