Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1355 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 7, 2022

Analysis

Analysis March 24, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 15, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 24, 2022