House | 03/14/2022 | Died in Public Integrity & Elections Committee | ||
House | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
House | 01/14/2022 | Now in Public Integrity & Elections Committee | ||
House | 01/14/2022 | Referred to State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 01/14/2022 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/14/2022 | Referred to Public Integrity & Elections Committee | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/08/2022 | Filed |