House
|
03/01/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 756
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Substituted CS/SB 756
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Favorable by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Reported out of Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Favorable by Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Added to Government Operations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Now in Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Reported out of Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
PCS added to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2022
|
Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2022
|
Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|