Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1453 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2022

Analysis

Analysis March 29, 2022
Analysis February 28, 2022
Analysis February 27, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022
Analysis February 4, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 28, 2022
Bill February 4, 2022