Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1551 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 28, 2022
Analysis February 27, 2022
Analysis February 9, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022