Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1555 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2022

Analysis

Analysis June 2, 2022
Analysis March 23, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis January 27, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022