House | 03/14/2022 | See HB 5001 (line item 125) | ||
House | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | Now in Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | Reported out of Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | Favorable by Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/10/2022 | Added to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda | ||
House | 09/27/2021 | Now in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 09/27/2021 | Referred to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 09/27/2021 | Referred to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 09/21/2021 | Filed |