06/02/2022 | Vetoed by Governor; See HB 5001 (line item 104) | |||
House | 03/14/2022 | See HB 5001 (line item 104) | ||
House | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 09/30/2021 | Now in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 09/30/2021 | Referred to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 09/30/2021 | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 09/29/2021 | Filed |