06/02/2022 | Vetoed by Governor; See HB 5001 (line item 1253A) | |||
House | 03/14/2022 | See HB 5001 (line item 1253A) | ||
House | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 12/02/2021 | Now in Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 12/02/2021 | Reported out of Justice Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 12/01/2021 | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 11/23/2021 | Added to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda | ||
House | 10/11/2021 | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 10/11/2021 | Referred to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 10/11/2021 | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 10/07/2021 | Filed |