House | 03/14/2022 | See HB 5001 (line item 2245A) | ||
House | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 12/01/2021 | Now in Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 12/01/2021 | Reported out of Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 12/01/2021 | Favorable by Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 11/23/2021 | Added to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda | ||
House | 10/11/2021 | Now in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 10/11/2021 | Referred to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 10/11/2021 | Referred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 10/07/2021 | Filed |