House | 03/14/2022 | Died in Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
House | 01/13/2022 | Now in Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 01/13/2022 | Reported out of Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/13/2022 | Favorable by Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | Added to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda | ||
House | 10/15/2021 | Now in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 10/15/2021 | Referred to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 10/15/2021 | Referred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 10/13/2021 | Filed |