House | 03/14/2022 | See HB 5001 (line item 372) | ||
House | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
House | 01/28/2022 | Now in Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 01/28/2022 | Reported out of Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/27/2022 | Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/25/2022 | Added to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 10/21/2021 | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 10/21/2021 | Referred to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 10/21/2021 | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 10/19/2021 | Filed |