House | 03/14/2022 | Died in Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | Now in Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | Reported out of State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | Favorable by State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/10/2022 | Added to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda | ||
House | 11/24/2021 | Now in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 11/24/2021 | Referred to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 11/24/2021 | Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 11/16/2021 | Filed |