House | 03/14/2022 | Died in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 12/08/2021 | Now in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 12/08/2021 | Referred to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 12/08/2021 | Referred to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 11/30/2021 | Filed |