06/03/2022 | Chapter No. 2022-159 | |||
06/02/2022 | Approved by Governor | |||
06/02/2022 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |||
House | 03/14/2022 | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | Passed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 33 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | Conference Committee Report adopted (506819) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | Conference Committee Report received | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | In returning messages | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Passed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 108, NAYS 0 | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Conference Committee Report adopted | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Amendment 506819 adopted | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Conference Committee Report considered | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | In Messages | ||
House | 03/11/2022 | Conference Committee appointed | ||
House | 03/11/2022 | Bill placed in Conference (Appropriations Conference Committee/Appropriations) | ||
Senate | 03/01/2022 | Conference Committee appointed: Appropriations Conference Committee/Appropriations: Stargel (Chair), Bean (At Large), Book (At Large), Gibson (At Large), Mayfield (At Large), Passidomo (At Large), Perry (At Large), Powell (At Large), Rouson (At Large), Stewart (At Large); Appropriations Conference Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government/Agriculture and Natural Resources: Albritton (Chair), Ausley, Berman, Boyd, Bradley, Brodeur, Garcia, Mayfield, Rodrigues, Stewart; Appropriations Conference Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government/State Administration and Technology: Albritton (Chair), Ausley, Berman, Boyd, Bradley, Brodeur, Garcia, Mayfield, Rodrigues, Stewart; Appropriations Conference Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice/Justice: Perry (Chair), Baxley, Bracy, Gainer, Pizzo, Rodriguez, Torres, Wright; Appropriations Conference Committee on Education/Higher Education: Broxson (Chair), Cruz, Diaz, Gibson, Gruters, Hutson, Passidomo, Polsky; Appropriations Conference Committee on Education/PreK-12: Broxson (Chair), Cruz, Diaz, Gibson, Gruters, Hutson, Passidomo, Polsky; Appropriations Conference Committee on Health and Human Services/Health Care: Bean (Chair), Book, Brodeur, Burgess, Diaz, Farmer, Harrell, Jones, Rodrigues, Rodriguez, Rouson; Appropriations Conference Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development/Infrastructure and Tourism: Gainer (Chair), Ausley, Boyd, Cruz, Garcia, Gibson, Hooper, Mayfield, Perry, Taddeo, Wright; | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | The Senate having refused to pass the bill as passed by the House, acceded to the request for a conference | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Amendment(s) adopted (383086) | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Received | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Substituted for SB 7038 | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Withdrawn from Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Immediately certified | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | Requests that the Senate pass the bill as passed by the House or agree to include the bill in the Budget Conference | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | Passed; YEAS 117, NAYS 0 | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Added to Third Reading Calendar | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Placed on 3rd reading | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/15/2022) | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | Bill referred to House Calendar | ||
House | 02/09/2022 | Filed |