Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H5009 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 16, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 16, 2022

Analysis

Analysis June 3, 2022
Analysis March 22, 2022
Analysis March 11, 2022
Analysis February 10, 2022