Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H6031 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 21, 2021

Analysis

Analysis January 19, 2022
Analysis January 14, 2022
Analysis December 2, 2021
Analysis November 24, 2021