House | 03/14/2022 | Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 10/06/2021 | Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee | ||
House | 10/06/2021 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 10/06/2021 | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 10/06/2021 | Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee | ||
House | 09/23/2021 | Filed |