Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H6515 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 10, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 24, 2022
Bill February 17, 2022
Bill January 27, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 16, 2022
Analysis January 27, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022