Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H7009 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 2, 2021

Enrolled

Bill February 18, 2022

Analysis

Analysis May 9, 2022
Analysis March 16, 2022
Analysis January 20, 2022
Analysis January 18, 2022
Analysis January 12, 2022
Analysis January 10, 2022