House
|
03/03/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to SB 7008
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Substituted SB 7008
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Favorable by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
Reported out of Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
Favorable by Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2022
|
Added to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
12/07/2021
|
Now in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/07/2021
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
12/07/2021
|
Referred to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/03/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|