Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H7027 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 16, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 16, 2022

Analysis

Analysis June 6, 2022
Analysis April 5, 2022
Analysis March 11, 2022
Analysis February 9, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 10, 2022